Global Patent Index - EP 1028637 A1

EP 1028637 A1 2000-08-23 - CIGARETTE WITH REDUCED GAS PHASE

Title (en)

CIGARETTE WITH REDUCED GAS PHASE

Title (de)

GASPHASENREDUZIERTE ZIGARETTE

Title (fr)

CIGARETTE A PHASE GAZEUSE REDUITE

Publication

EP 1028637 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951904 A

Priority

EP 9706390 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925210A1] The invention relates to a cigarette with a filter containing activated carbon. Said cigarette comprises a tobacco string wrapped in cigarette paper, a double filter having a string-side part consisting of a tissue paper containing carbon, and a peripherally extending filter ventilation zone and located in the mouth-side part made of cellulose acetate. The tissue paper of the string-side filter part is a very bulky paper which contains 20 to 50 % wt microfine powdered active carbon. The ratio of condensate retention capacities of the string-side filter part to the mouth-side filter part ranges from 1 to 2. The air permeability of the cigarette paper is comprised between 40 and 100 Coresta units and the filter ventilation grade is comprised between 5 and 60 %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24D 3/16; A24D 3/04; A24D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24D 1/04 (2006.01); A24D 3/04 (2006.01); A24D 3/10 (2006.01); A24D 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/10 (2013.01); A24D 3/043 (2013.01); A24D 3/163 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925210A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925210 A1 19990527; AT 220862 T 20020815; BG 104522 A 20010131; BG 63987 B1 20030930; DE 59707821 D1 20020829; DK 1028637 T3 20021111; EA 001556 B1 20010423; EA 200000507 A1 20001030; EE 200000264 A 20010615; EP 1028637 A1 20000823; EP 1028637 B1 20020724; ES 2179383 T3 20030116; HK 1035472 A1 20040910; HU 0100096 A2 20010528; HU 0100096 A3 20010628; HU 228293 B1 20130828; JP 2001522616 A 20011120; JP 3387055 B2 20030317; KR 20010032084 A 20010416; SK 283397 B6 20030701; SK 6942000 A3 20001009; TR 200001355 T2 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131113

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131114

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150407

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131113

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131113

2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59707821

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20140710

2014-08-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140513

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131113

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131113

2014-08-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-08-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020403056

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131113

2014-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 220862 T

- Effective date: 20131113

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-05-20 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140513

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121110

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121107

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120514

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121114

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20121016

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121107

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20121112

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-11-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2005-08-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN GMBH; DE

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20041208

2005-07-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20041113

2005-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN GMBH

- Free text: REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN GMBH#PARKSTRASSE 51#22605 HAMBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN GMBH#MAX-BORN-STRASSE 4#22761 HAMBURG (DE)

2005-06-30 [REG PT TE4A] CHANGE OF ADDRESS (PATENT)

- Free text: REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN GMBH DE

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-05-25 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20041208

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-07-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-12-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-11-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-11-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO (INVESTMENTS) LIMITED

2003-06-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO (INVESTMENTS) LIMITED

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030103

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179383 T3

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-11-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021119

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20021114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403056

2002-11-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-11-08 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20021108

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59707821 20020829

2002-08-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000531;LV PAYMENT 20000531;MK PAYMENT 20000531;RO PAYMENT 20000531;SI PAYMENT 20000531

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 220862 T 20020815

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: REEMTSMA CIGARETTENFABRIKEN GMBH

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010925

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000531;LV PAYMENT 20000531;MK PAYMENT 20000531;RO PAYMENT 20000531;SI PAYMENT 20000531