Global Patent Index - EP 1028735 A1

EP 1028735 A1 2000-08-23 - THERAPEUTIC METHODS COMPRISING USE OF A NEUREGULIN

Title (en)

THERAPEUTIC METHODS COMPRISING USE OF A NEUREGULIN

Title (de)

THERAPEUTISCHE METHODE DIE DIE VERWENDUNG EINES NEUROREGULINS BEINHALTED

Title (fr)

METHODE THERAPEUTIQUES COMPORTANT L'UTILISATION D'UNE NEUREGULINE

Publication

EP 1028735 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98949803 A

Priority

  • US 9821349 W
  • US 6210997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918976A1] The invention provides methods for treatment and/or prophylaxis of certain neurological-related disorders, particularly treatment or prophylaxis of the effects of stroke, brain or spinal cord injury or ischemia, heart attack, optic nerve and retinal injury and ischemia and other acute-type conditions disclosed herein as well as chronic-type conditions, specifically epilepsy, Alzheimer's disease, Parkinson's disease, Huntington's disease, Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis, Down's Syndrome, Korsakoff's disease, cerebral palsy and/or age-dependent dementia. The methods of the invention comprise administration of a neuregulin, or fragment or derivative of a neuregulin, or a nucleic acid encoding a neuregulin or a neuregulin fragment or derivative, to a patient suffering from or susceptible to such conditions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/70; A61K 38/00; A61K 38/02; A61K 38/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/18 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 21/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/14 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); C07K 14/485 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/1883 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918976 A1 19990422; AU 745324 B2 20020321; AU 9604298 A 19990503; CA 2306228 A1 19990422; EP 1028735 A1 20000823; EP 1028735 A4 20030806; JP 2001519400 A 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2003-08-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030623

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 25/00 B

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/18 A

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/475 B

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 48/00 B

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENES PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENES PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE