Global Patent Index - EP 1028812 A1

EP 1028812 A1 2000-08-23 - CYCLONE SEPARATOR

Title (en)

CYCLONE SEPARATOR

Title (de)

ZYKLONABSCHEIDER

Title (fr)

CYCLONE SEPARATEUR

Publication

EP 1028812 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98952853 A

Priority

  • GB 9803302 W
  • GB 9723342 A
  • GB 9817074 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922872A1] A cyclone separator comprises an inlet chamber (52) including means (51) to introduce a fluid mixture to swirl about an axis (55) within the chamber, an outlet chamber (53) spaced along said axis from the inlet chamber and including a first outlet (62) for heavier phases of the mixture and a second outlet (63) for lighter phases of the mixture, and an intermediate chamber (54) connecting the inlet and outlet chambers, the intermediate chamber being, at its junction with the inlet chamber, of not greater dimensions radially of said axis than the minimum such dimension of the inlet chamber. The velocity of swirl during separation is maintained by this relationship, and is increased when the entry of the intermediate chamber is smaller; tapering inwards of the intermediate chamber also increases the swirl velocity and hence the separation efficiency.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/16 (2006.01); B04C 3/04 (2006.01); B04C 3/06 (2006.01); B04C 5/103 (2006.01); B04C 5/185 (2006.01); B04C 5/26 (2006.01); B04C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/1658 (2013.01); A47L 9/1625 (2013.01); A47L 9/165 (2013.01); B04C 3/04 (2013.01); B04C 3/06 (2013.01); B04C 5/103 (2013.01); B04C 5/185 (2013.01); B04C 5/26 (2013.01); B04C 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922872A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9922872 A1 19990514; AU 1040299 A 19990524; DE 69805093 D1 20020529; DE 69805093 T2 20021128; EP 1028812 A1 20000823; EP 1028812 B1 20020424; EP 1157651 A2 20011128; EP 1157651 A3 20011205; GB 9817074 D0 19981007

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69805093

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131104

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-09-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2004-05-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-09-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69805093 20020529

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT