Global Patent Index - EP 1028831 B1

EP 1028831 B1 2002-11-13 - ACTUATING TOOL

Title (en)

ACTUATING TOOL

Title (de)

BETÄTIGUNGSWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

OUTIL D'ACTIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1028831 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98938686 A

Priority

  • DE 19744534 A
  • EP 9804128 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19744534A1] The screw driver head has a groove (17) for a spring ring with a width larger than that of the ring (21). The ring supports itself flexibly on at least parts of the side walls (41,43) of the groove. The spring ring is open and/or forms a helical winding. The depth of the groove is the same as or larger than the ring depth. When unloaded, the ring projects over all faces of the socket head on the screw driver, and is completely contained in the groove when under load.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 15/00; B25B 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/54 (2006.01); B25B 15/00 (2006.01); B25B 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/108 (2013.01); B25B 15/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19744534 A1 19990422; DE 19744534 C2 20001207; AU 8731598 A 19990503; EP 1028831 A1 20000823; EP 1028831 B1 20021113; JP 3151178 B2 20010403; JP H11114844 A 19990427; TW 371638 B 19991011; US 6302001 B1 20011016; WO 9919119 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130704

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120727

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060704

2006-07-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060704

2005-06-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-01-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WIHA WERKZEUGE GMBH

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI