Global Patent Index - EP 1028857 A1

EP 1028857 A1 2000-08-23 - IMITATION STONES FOR DECORATING BUILDING STRUCTURES AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

IMITATION STONES FOR DECORATING BUILDING STRUCTURES AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

NATURSTEIN-IMITATION FÜR VERZIERUNGSBAUTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRERHERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

IMITATION PIERRE POUR CONSTRUCTIONS ORNEMENTALES ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1028857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98904454 A

Priority

  • RO 9800004 W
  • RO 9702040 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922947A1] The invention relates to an imitation stone for decorating building structures which is comprised of three layers. One layer is discontinuous of the surface having different colorings and a thickness of 0-5 mm. A second layer is a continuous intermediate layer having only one color and a thickness of 2-5 mm. A third layer is a base and resistance inner layer having a thickness of 3-10 mm. The shape and coloring of the stone imitates those of natural stone. The first two layers have 28-48 wt. % polyester resin with reinforcers, or polyvinyl chloride or polystyrene optionally with the addition of cross-linking agents, 50-70 wt. % quartz powder and 2-10 wt. % pigments. The inner layer has 100 wt. % polyurethane foam with reinforcers or 20-35 wt. % fiber glass and 65-80 wt. % polyester resin with reinforcers. The imitation stone is produced in a rigid or flexible structure in which the mixture for the surface layer, the intermediate layer, and the base layer is successively applied by spraying or with a brush. The layers cure and combine with one another. The product is manually pulled out of the interior of the structure and the entire external surface is sandblasted. An additional method is comprised of applying a continuous layer of the curing base mixture on the inner surface of the structure. The mixture is manually pulled out and a continuous layer of the mixture having only one color is applied on the entire external surface of the layer. The mixture hardens and discontinuous mixtures for the surface layer having different colorings are applied over said continuous layer. The mixture hardens and the entire external surface is sandblasted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44F 9/04; B44C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 5/06 (2006.01); B32B 27/40 (2006.01); B44C 3/04 (2006.01); B44C 5/04 (2006.01); B44F 9/04 (2006.01); E04F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44C 3/042 (2013.01); B05D 5/061 (2013.01); B44C 5/0423 (2013.01); B44F 9/04 (2013.01); E04F 13/147 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922947A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9922947 A1 19990514; AT 216655 T 20020515; DE 59803937 D1 20020529; EP 1028857 A1 20000823; EP 1028857 B1 20020424; ES 2175667 T3 20021116; PL 340289 A1 20010129; RO 113830 B1 19981130; SK 189299 A3 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090225

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090226

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090226

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DRAGNEA MIHAI

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175667 T3

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803937 20020529

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216655 T 20020515

2002-04-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STONE IMITATION FOR DECORATING BUILDING STRUCTURES AND METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT