Global patent index - EP 1028909 A1

EP 1028909 A1 2000-08-23 - REEL FOR SUPPORTING OPTICAL FIBRES AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE DEFORMATIONS EXPERIENCED BY THE SAID REEL DURING WINDING

Title (en)

REEL FOR SUPPORTING OPTICAL FIBRES AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE DEFORMATIONS EXPERIENCED BY THE SAID REEL DURING WINDING

Title (de)

SPULE ZUM TRAGEN VON GLASFASERN UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONTROLLIEREN DER VERFORMUNGEN, DIE DIESE SPULE WÄHREND DES AUFWICKELNS ERFÄHRT

Title (fr)

BOBINE DE SUPPORT DE FIBRES OPTIQUES ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DES DEFORMATIONS SUBIES PAR LADITE BOBINE LORS DE L'ENROULEMENT

Publication

EP 1028909 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98959831 A

Priority

  • EP 98959831 A
  • EP 9806969 W
  • EP 97119380 A
  • US 6447097 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924345A1] Reel for supporting optical fibres comprising a winding drum (2) having a tubular cylindrical shape, a pair of containing flanges (3), each of which is positioned close to one of the end edges (2a) of the said drum, a central core (6) positioned coaxially inside the winding drum (2) and at least one pair of interconnecting flanges (7) positioned either side of a transverse median plane (X-X) of the reel (1), each of which extends from the central core (6) to the winding drum (2). The said interconnecting flanges (7) are joined to the winding drum (2) at an attachment point (P) and to the central core at an anchor point (P'). This anchor point (P') is positioned closer to the transverse median plane (X-X) of the reel than is the attachment point (P) so as to form a given angle between the said interconnecting flange (7) and the core (6) such as to limit deformation of the containing flanges during rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/14 (2013.01); B65H 2701/32 (2013.01); B65H 2701/5122 (2013.01); B65H 2701/5136 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924345A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924345 A1 19990520; AR 014018 A1 20010131; AU 1559299 A 19990531; AU 734709 B2 20010621; BR 9813954 A 20000926; CA 2308560 A1 19990520; CA 2308560 C 20070710; DE 69803941 T2 20021017; EP 1028909 A1 20000823; EP 1028909 B1 20020220; ES 2172250 T3 20020916; JP 2001522769 A 20011120; NZ 504558 A 20030530

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101105

2012-03-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120305

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101104

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69803941

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101104

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2007-09-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2007-09-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2007-06-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2007-06-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-02-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172250

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-07-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69803941

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-28

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010615

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT