Global patent index - EP 1028925 A2

EP 1028925 A2 2000-08-23 - RESISTANT PORCELAIN AGAINST HEAT CHANGES

Title (en)

RESISTANT PORCELAIN AGAINST HEAT CHANGES

Title (de)

GEGEN TEMPERATURÄNDERUNGEN BESTÄNDIGES PORZELLAN

Title (fr)

PORCELAINE RESISTANT AUX ECARTS THERMIQUES

Publication

EP 1028925 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99933464 A

Priority

  • TR 9900031 W
  • TR 9801455 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006513A2] The subject of the presented invention is porcelain used as a house-effect that has a special rational composition of raw materials and resistant against sudden and high graded heat changes and in form of a dish which filled with liquid and placed on heat source with flame there is no fracture, crack and deformation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/00 (2006.01); A47J 36/02 (2006.01); C04B 33/13 (2006.01); C04B 33/24 (2006.01); C04B 33/34 (2006.01); C04B 41/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 33/34 (2013.01); C04B 33/24 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • FUNK W.: "ROHSTOFFE DER FEINKERAMIK - IHRE AUFBEREITUNG UND VERARBEITUNG ZU MASSEN UND GLASUREN", 1936, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, pages: 296, XP002949367
  • GILCHREST G.I. AND KLINEFELTER T.A.: "Electrical Porcelain", ELECTR. J., 1918, pages 36 - 39, XP000945126
  • KRAUSE O.: "STRUKTURUNTERSUCHUNGEN AM HARTPORZELLAN", 1928, pages: 247 - 263, XP000944958
  • HECHT H.: "LEHRBUCH DER KERAMIK", 1930, VERLAG URBAN & SCHWARZENBERG, BERLIN, article "Formgebung der Tonwaren", pages: 81, XP002949368
  • HECHT H.: "LEHRBUCH DER KERAMIK", 1930, VERLAG URBAN & SCHWARZENBERG, BERLIN, article "Das Trocknen der Tonwaren", pages: 99, XP002949369
  • HECHT H.: "LEHRBUCH DER KERAMIK", 1930, VERLAG URBAN & SCHWARZENBERG, BERLIN, article "Das Brennen der Tonwaren", pages: 102, XP002949370
  • HECHT H.: "LEHRBUCH DER KERAMIK", 1930, VERLAG URBAN & SCHWARZENBERG, BERLIN, article "Das Glasieren", pages: 408, XP002949371
  • MÖRTEL H.: "Schnellbrandporzellen - Möglichkeiten und Grenzen", CFI, 1985, XP002949372
  • FUNK W.: "ROHSTOFFE DER FEINKERAMIK - IHRE AUFBEREITUNG UND VERARBEITUNG ZU MASSEN UND GLASUREN", 1936, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, article "Die Massen und Glasuren der einzelnen feinkeramischen Warengattungen", pages: 316, XP002949373
  • SCHÜLLER K.H.: "BER.DT.KERAM.GES. 40", part IV 1963, article "Untersuchungen über die Gefügeausbildung im Porzellan", XP000944845
  • FUNK W.: "ROHSTOFFE DER FEINKERAMIK - IHRE AUFBEREITUNG UND VERARBEITUNG ZU MASSEN UND GLASUREN", 1936, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, article "Hartporzellan", pages: 295, XP002949374
  • HANDREK H.: "Technik und Wissenschaft", KERAMISCHE RUNDSCHAU UND KUNST - KERAMIK, vol. 36, no. 19, 10 May 1928 (1928-05-10), pages 363 - 365, XP002949375
  • FUNK W.: "ROHSTOFFE DER FEINKERAMIK - IHRE AUFBEREITUNG UND VERARBEITUNG ZU MASSEN UND GLASUREN", 1936, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, article "Feuerfeste und hochfeuerfeste feinkeramische Erzeugnisse", pages: 315 - 322, XP002949376
  • See also references of WO 0006513A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006513 A2 20000210; WO 0006513 A3 20000427; AU 4951499 A 20000221; BG 104306 A 20010531; CN 1274340 A 20001122; EP 1028925 A2 20000823; HU 0003889 A2 20010328; JP 2003520174 A 20030702; PL 340267 A1 20010129

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011106

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000428