Global Patent Index - EP 1028945 B9

EP 1028945 B9 2009-02-18 - SUBSTITUTED PYRIDINE COMPOUNDS AS ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENTS

Title (en)

SUBSTITUTED PYRIDINE COMPOUNDS AS ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENTS

Title (de)

SUBSTITUIERTE PYRIDIN-DERIVATE ALS ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDE MITTEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSES PYRIDINE SUBSTITUES PRESENTANT UNE ACTION ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRE

Publication

EP 1028945 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 98956570 A

Priority

  • US 9823510 W
  • US 6495397 P
  • US 18511998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924404A1] Selected substituted pyridine compounds of formula (I) or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, wherein a. o. X is O, S, S(O), S(O)2 or NR<2>; Y is -C(O)-NR<3>R<4> or -NR<4>-C(O)-R<3>; R<1> is a cycloalkyl, aryl, heterocyclyl or heteroaryl radical which is optionally substituted by 1-4 radicals of alkyl, halo, haloalkyl, cyano, azido, nitro, amidino, R<18>-Z<18>- or R<18>-Z<18>-alkyl; provided that the total number of aryl, heteroaryl, cycloalkyl and heterocyclyl radicals in R<1> is 1-3; and provided when Y is -NR<4>-C(O)-R<3> and X is O or S, R<1> is other than a 2-pyrimidinyl radical; R<2> is a hydrogen or alkyl radical; R<3> is an aryl or heteroaryl radical which is optionally substituted by 1-5 radicals of alkyl, halo, haloalkyl, cyano, azido, nitro, amidino, R<19>-Z<19>- or R<19>-Z<19>-alkyl; provided that the total number of aryl and heteroaryl radicals in R<3> is 1-3; and provided when Y is -C(O)- NR<3>R<4>, R<3> is other than a phenyl or naphthyl having an amino, nitro, cyano, carboxy or alkoxycarbonyl, are effective for prophylaxis and treatment of diseases, such as TNF- alpha , IL-1 beta , IL-6 and/or IL-8 mediated diseases, and other maladies, such as pain and diabetes. The invention encompasses novel compounds, analogs, prodrugs and pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof, pharmaceutical compositions and methods for prophylaxis and treatment of diseases and other maladies or conditions involving inflammation, pain, diabetes, cancer and the like. The subject invention also relates to processes for making such compounds as well as to intermediates useful in such processes.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/73 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4418 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/443 (2006.01); A61K 31/4433 (2006.01); A61K 31/4436 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/444 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 3/14 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/08 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 21/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 27/16 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); C07D 213/75 (2006.01); C07D 213/82 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/73 (2013.01); C07D 213/75 (2013.01); C07D 213/82 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 405/12 (2013.01); C07D 409/12 (2013.01); C07D 413/12 (2013.01); C07D 417/12 (2013.01); C07D 471/04 (2013.01); Y10S 514/886 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924404 A1 19990520; AT 366722 T 20070815; AU 1306599 A 19990531; AU 742442 B2 20020103; CA 2307552 A1 19990520; CA 2307552 C 20040608; DE 69838070 D1 20070823; DE 69838070 T2 20071025; EP 1028945 A1 20000823; EP 1028945 B1 20070711; EP 1028945 B9 20071128; EP 1028945 B9 20090218; ES 2290997 T3 20080216; JP 2001522834 A 20011120; US 2002035094 A1 20020321; US 6022884 A 20000208; US 6184237 B1 20010206; US 6333341 B1 20011225; US 6458813 B1 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081105

2010-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081104

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081104

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071104

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070711

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081104

2009-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-19 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028244

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071105

2008-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071011

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AMGEN INC.

- Free text: AMGEN INC.#ONE AMGEN CENTER DRIVE#THOUSAND OAKS, CA 91320-1799 (US) -TRANSFER TO- AMGEN INC.#ONE AMGEN CENTER DRIVE#THOUSAND OAKS, CA 91320-1799 (US)

2008-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080414

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070711

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071012

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071108

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070711

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070711

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2290997 T3

2008-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070711

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070711

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071211

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071101

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20070711

2007-09-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2007-09-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69838070 P 20070823

2007-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2007-07-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030925

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000504;LT PAYMENT 20000504;LV PAYMENT 20000504;MK PAYMENT 20000504;RO PAYMENT 20000504;SI PAYMENT 20000504