Global Patent Index - EP 1029032 A1

EP 1029032 A1 2000-08-23 - LAUNDRY TREATMENT PRODUCTS FOR SPANDEX CONTAINING FABRICS

Title (en)

LAUNDRY TREATMENT PRODUCTS FOR SPANDEX CONTAINING FABRICS

Title (de)

WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL FÜR TEXTILIEN MIT SPANDEXFASERN

Title (fr)

PRODUITS DE TRAITEMENT POUR LE LAVAGE DU LINGE DESTINES A DES TISSUS A BASE DE SPANDEX

Publication

EP 1029032 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946614 A

Priority

  • GB 9803053 W
  • GB 9721586 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919452A1] A fabric treatment product containing a perfume which includes a mixture of fragrance materials, for the treatment of garments containing Spandex3 and other fibres, preferably after wearing thereof, to deposit fragrance materials to a greater extent on the Spandex3 fibres than on the other fibres. The fabric treatment product may be selected from a detergent composition for fabric washing, a pre-treatment composition, a rinse conditioner, or an additive composition for use with any of these.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/50; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); D06M 13/00 (2006.01); D06M 13/144 (2006.01); D06M 101/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/50 (2013.01); C11D 3/001 (2013.01); C11D 3/505 (2013.01); D06M 13/005 (2013.01); D06M 2101/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919452A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919452 A1 19990422; AR 015180 A1 20010418; AU 731714 B2 20010405; AU 9361098 A 19990503; BR 9812898 A 20000808; CA 2305529 A1 19990422; CA 2305529 C 20080729; CN 1281504 A 20010124; DE 69822189 D1 20040408; DE 69822189 T2 20050113; EP 1029032 A1 20000823; EP 1029032 B1 20040303; ES 2215320 T3 20041001; GB 9721586 D0 19971210; HU 0003663 A2 20010228; HU 0003663 A3 20030228; IN 192710 B 20040515; JP 2001520322 A 20011030; PL 189691 B1 20050930; PL 339767 A1 20010102; SK 285260 B6 20061005; SK 5022000 A3 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2215320

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69822189

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010703

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT