Global Patent Index - EP 1029042 A1

EP 1029042 A1 2000-08-23 - A PH SENSITIVE POTASSIUM CHANNEL IN SPERMATOCYTES

Title (en)

A PH SENSITIVE POTASSIUM CHANNEL IN SPERMATOCYTES

Title (de)

EIN PH-EMPFINDLICHER CALCIUMKANALIN SPERNATOZYTEN

Title (fr)

CANAL A POTASSIUM SENSIBLE AU pH PRESENT DANS DES SPERMATOCYTES

Publication

EP 1029042 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953857 A

Priority

  • US 9822321 W
  • US 6313897 P
  • US 7617298 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9920754A1] The invention provides isolated nucleic acid and amino acid sequences of Slo3, a pH sensitive potassium channel expressed in sperm; antibodies to Slo3; methods of screening for Slo3 inhibitors; and methods of screening for Slo3 homologs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/11; C07H 21/04; C07K 14/00; C07K 16/00; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/85; C12Q 1/00; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/567; G06F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/84 (2013.01); C07K 14/705 (2013.01); G01N 33/68 (2013.01); G01N 33/6872 (2013.01); G01N 2500/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9920754 A1 19990429; AU 1112299 A 19990510; CA 2307062 A1 19990429; EP 1029042 A1 20000823; EP 1029042 A4 20041013

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060216

2004-10-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040830

2004-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY

2004-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ICAGEN, INCORPORATED

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ICAGEN, INC.

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE