Global Patent Index - EP 1029065 A1

EP 1029065 A1 2000-08-23 - GENE CODING FOR THANATIN, VECTOR CONTAINING SAME AND RESULTING TRANSFORMED DISEASE-RESISTANT PLANTS

Title (en)

GENE CODING FOR THANATIN, VECTOR CONTAINING SAME AND RESULTING TRANSFORMED DISEASE-RESISTANT PLANTS

Title (de)

GEN, WELCHES FÜR THANATIN KODIERT, DIESES BEINHALTENDER VEKTOR UND TRANSFORMIERTE, GEGEN KRANKHEITEN RESISTENTE PFLANZEN

Title (fr)

GENE CODANT POUR LA THANATINE, VECTEUR LE CONTENANT ET PLANTES TRANSFORMEES OBTENUES RESISTANTES AUX MALADIES

Publication

EP 1029065 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98954531 A

Priority

  • FR 9802375 W
  • FR 9714263 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2770853A1] The invention concerns a DNA sequence coding for thanatin, a vector containing it for transforming a host organism and the transformation method. More particularly the invention concerns the transformation of plant cells and plants, the drosomycin produced by the plants providing them with resistance to diseases, particularly of fungal origin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 5/00; C07K 14/435; C12N 15/62; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/29 (2006.01); C12N 15/31 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/43563 (2013.01); C12N 15/8282 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924594A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770853 A1 19990514; FR 2770853 B1 19991231; AR 017574 A1 20010912; AU 1160499 A 19990531; AU 758749 B2 20030327; CA 2309323 A1 19990520; EP 1029065 A1 20000823; HU 0100084 A2 20030128; HU 0100084 A3 20030228; IL 136004 D0 20010520; JP 2001521758 A 20011113; NZ 504505 A 20020628; PL 340374 A1 20010129; US 6770798 B1 20040803; WO 9924594 A1 19990520; ZA 9810183 B 19990507

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031030

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE