Global Patent Index - EP 1029088 A1

EP 1029088 A1 2000-08-23 - WITHDRAWAL DEVICE FOR A SHAFT FURNACE

Title (en)

WITHDRAWAL DEVICE FOR A SHAFT FURNACE

Title (de)

AUSTRAGVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHACHTOFEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'EXTRACTION POUR FOUR A CUVE

Publication

EP 1029088 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961102 A

Priority

  • AT 189297 A
  • EP 9806794 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924626A1] The invention relates to a shaft furnace (1), especially a direct reduction shaft furnace, with a charging stock (2) of lumpy material, especially lumpy material containing iron oxide and/or sponge iron, and conveyor screws (3) for removing the lumpy material from the shaft furnace (1). Said conveyor screws intersperse the shaft furnace casing in which they are mounted and are arranged over the floor area of the shaft furnace (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 13/02; F27B 1/21; F27D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 33/08 (2006.01); B65G 65/46 (2006.01); C21B 13/02 (2006.01); F27B 1/21 (2006.01); F27D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 13/02 (2013.01); F27B 1/21 (2013.01); F27D 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924626A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924626 A1 19990520; AT 405455 B 19990825; AT A189297 A 19981215; AU 1664399 A 19990531; AU 735530 B2 20010712; BR 9812775 A 20001010; CA 2308388 A1 19990520; CN 1090680 C 20020911; CN 1278305 A 20001227; DE 59801664 D1 20011108; EP 1029088 A1 20000823; EP 1029088 B1 20011004; JP 2001522937 A 20011120; PL 340872 A1 20010312; RU 2194770 C2 20021220; SK 6672000 A3 20001107; TR 200001243 T2 20001121; TW 406178 B 20000921; US 6280181 B1 20010828; ZA 9810170 B 19990507

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131026

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801664

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121216

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-10-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051026

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031026

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE *VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU G.M.B.H

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-10-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031026

2002-10-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020926

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020925

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011218

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801664 20011108

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU NL SE

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU NL SE