Global Patent Index - EP 1029089 A1

EP 1029089 A1 2000-08-23 - METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS SMELTING OF SOLID METAL PRODUCTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS SMELTING OF SOLID METAL PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN SCHMELZEN VON METALLISCHEN FESTSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA FUSION EN CONTINU DE PRODUITS METALLIQUES SOLIDES

Publication

EP 1029089 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98956840 A

Priority

  • EP 9806091 W
  • LU 90154 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9920802A1] The invention concerns a method for continuous smelting of solid metal products in a reactor comprising a smelting zone and a metallurgical processing zone, which consists in continuously heating the solid metal products in the smelting zone, gradually transferring said smelted products into the metallurgical process zone, refining the smelted products in the metallurgical process zone in an oxidising slag medium, separating the metallurgical process zone slag from the smelting zone slag, transforming the oxidising slag in the metallurgical process zone into a reducing slag, desulphurizing the smelted products in the metallurgical processing zone in a reducing slag medium and casting the smelted metal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 5/52; C21C 5/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/52 (2006.01); C21C 5/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/5252 (2013.01); C21C 5/567 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9920802A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9920802 A1 19990429; AR 013667 A1 20010110; AT 221134 T 20020815; AU 1334599 A 19990510; BR 9812926 A 20000808; DE 69806796 D1 20020829; DE 69806796 T2 20030220; EP 1029089 A1 20000823; EP 1029089 B1 20020724; ES 2178285 T3 20021216; LU 90154 A2 19990419; MA 24658 A1 19990401; TW 400389 B 20000801; US 6314123 B1 20011106; ZA 9808966 B 19990412

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060925

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060925

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060924

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060924

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-09-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060924

2005-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050816

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050810

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178285 T3

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806796 20020829

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221134 T 20020815

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB