Global patent index - EP 1029093 A1

EP 1029093 A1 2000-08-23 - METHOD FOR REPROCESSING STEEL SLAGS AND FERRIFEROUS MATERIALS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REPROCESSING STEEL SLAGS AND FERRIFEROUS MATERIALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM AUFARBEITEN VON STAHLSCHLACKEN UND EISENTRÄGERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR RETRAITER DES LAITIERS D'ACIER ET DES MATERIAUX FERRIFERES

Publication

EP 1029093 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99944155 A

Priority

  • AT 9900224 W
  • AT 155698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0015855A1] The invention relates to a method for reprocessing steel slags and ferriferous materials, e.g. electric furnace slags, converter slags, fine ores, dusts from steel manufacturing, millscale for obtaining pig iron and environmentally safe slags, wherein a molten slag and an iron bath are used at a volume ratio ranging between 0.5:1 and 1.5:1, wherein carboniferous material is introduced in the bath and hot air is blown. A mixed slag is obtained from the initial slags and the ferriferous materials having alkalinity CaO/SiO2 ranging between 1.2 and 2.5 and placed in a hearth type furnace or a ladle, wherein hot air for post-combustion of CO formed from the carbon in the bath is blown with a post-combustion degree of PC = (a) (CO2 + H2O)/(CO + CO2 + H2 + H2O) between 0.70 and 0.85. The hot exhaust gases of the furnace or the ladle are evacuated tangentially to the axis of the mouth of the hot air feeding lance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 7/04; C21B 3/00; C21B 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 3/06 (2006.01); C22B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 7/04 (2013.01); C21B 3/06 (2013.01); Y02P 10/212 (2015.11); Y02W 30/543 (2015.05)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0015855A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0015855 A1 20000323; AT 407051 B 20001227; AT A155698 A 20000415; AU 5720199 A 20000403; CA 2310044 A1 20000323; EP 1029093 A1 20000823; ES 2151473 T1 20010101; US 6364929 B1 20020402; ZA 200002582 B 20001121

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2001-02-09 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2001-01-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151473

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

2000-10-25 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000610

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE