Global Patent Index - EP 1029100 A1

EP 1029100 A1 2000-08-23 - PRODUCT WITH A LAYER SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING AGAINST A HOT AGGRESSIVE GAS

Title (en)

PRODUCT WITH A LAYER SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING AGAINST A HOT AGGRESSIVE GAS

Title (de)

ERZEUGNIS MIT EINEM SCHICHTSYSTEM ZUM SCHUTZ GEGEN EIN HEISSES AGGRESSIVES GAS

Title (fr)

PRODUIT POURVU D'UN SYSTEME STRATIFIE POUR LA PROTECTION CONTRE UN GAZ CHAUD AGRESSIF

Publication

EP 1029100 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98959748 A

Priority

  • DE 9803092 W
  • DE 19748506 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923270A1] The invention relates to a product (1) comprising a metallic base body (2) and a layer system (3) located on said base body for protecting the same against a hot aggressive gas (4). The layer system (3) has an adhesive layer (7) consisting of an MCrAlY-type alloy with an added 0.1 to 10 % lanthanum and 0 to 10 % hafnium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/08; C23C 30/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/3215 (2013.01); C23C 28/00 (2013.01); C23C 28/345 (2013.01); C23C 28/3455 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12535 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12611 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12618 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923270A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923270 A1 19990514; EP 1029100 A1 20000823; EP 1029100 B1 20010919; JP 2001521987 A 20011113; US 6416882 B1 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101021

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101021

2011-08-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801544

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101021

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091019

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-09-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011224

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801544 20011025

2001-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI