Global Patent Index - EP 1029117 A1

EP 1029117 A1 2000-08-23 - METHOD FOR SEPARATING LAYERS FROM ARTICLES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SEPARATING LAYERS FROM ARTICLES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ENTSCHICHTEN VON KÖRPERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR L'ENLEVEMENT DE COUCHES SUR DES CORPS

Publication

EP 1029117 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951155 A

Priority

  • CH 9800479 W
  • CH 258897 A
  • CH 140398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924642A1] The present invention relates to a method for separating layers from articles made of high-speed steel and comprising at least one layer of TiN, TiCN and TiAlN. This method comprises applying an alkaline solution containing hydrogen peroxide, a base as well as a substance selected from the group comprising phosphates, phosphonates and phosphonic acids.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23G 1/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23F 1/00 (2006.01); C23G 1/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23G 1/19 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924642A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924642 A1 19990520; DE 59811875 D1 20040930; EP 1029117 A1 20000823; EP 1029117 B1 20040825; ES 2226178 T3 20050316; JP 2001522943 A 20011120; JP 2009167534 A 20090730; JP 4326144 B2 20090902; JP 5295853 B2 20130918; US 6432219 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151014

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-15 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TRADING AG, TRUBBACH

- Effective date: 20110303

2006-10-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: OERLIKON TRADING AG, TRUEBBACH

- Free text: UNAXIS TRADING AG#C/O BALZERS AG#9477 TRUEBBACH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- OERLIKON TRADING AG, TRUEBBACH# #9477 TRUEBBACH (CH)

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-07-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226178 T3

2004-12-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811875 P 20040930

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNAXIS TRADING AG

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE