Global Patent Index - EP 1029129 A1

EP 1029129 A1 2000-08-23 - SOUNDPROOF WALL

Title (en)

SOUNDPROOF WALL

Title (de)

LÄRMSCHUTZWAND

Title (fr)

MUR ANTIBRUIT

Publication

EP 1029129 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948611 A

Priority

  • AT 9800246 W
  • AT 70297 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924670A1] The invention concerns a soundproof wall (1) consisting of soundproof plates (8, 9) in particle boards bonded with cement and with a grooved profile, said particle boards being fixed to a frame (6). The frames are inserted in double T vertical members (3) and the plates (8, 9) are fixed to the frame (6) covering the segments of the vertical members (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/0029 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924670A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924670 A1 19990520; AT 2529 U1 19981228; CZ 20001453 A3 20001213; CZ 290465 B6 20020717; DE 59808390 D1 20030618; EP 1029129 A1 20000823; EP 1029129 B1 20030514; HR P20000127 A2 20010228; HR PK20000127 B1 20020630; HU 0003539 A2 20010228; HU 0003539 A3 20020128; PL 194034 B1 20070430; PL 339840 A1 20010102; SK 284741 B6 20051006; SK 6052000 A3 20001211

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101016

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101016

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808390

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VELOX WERK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808390 P 20030618

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2003-05-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030514

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011102

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990916

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990916