Global patent index - EP 1029150 A1

EP 1029150 A1 2000-08-23 - DEVICE FOR CUTTING OR KIRVING MATERIAL

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CUTTING OR KIRVING MATERIAL

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN BZW. SCHRÄMEN VON MATERIAL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE COUPER OU DE HAVER DES MATERIAUX

Publication

EP 1029150 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954053 A

Priority

  • AT 9800270 W
  • AT 186597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923356A1] The invention relates to a device for cutting or kirving material on an essentially flat working face. Said device has a kirving tool which is mounted on a swivelling boom in such a way that it can rotate. Said boom consists of at least two boom parts (6, 7) which pivot in relation to each other. The swivelling axis of the boom and the swivelling axes (8, 9) of the boom parts (6, 7) pass through the breast. Planetary gears are arranged coaxially to the swivelling axes (8, 9) of the boom or boom parts (6, 7) and decrease the rotational speed of the turning drives for the swivelling drive to a reduced swivelling speed of the boom or the boom parts (6, 7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21C 27/24; E21D 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21C 27/22 (2006.01); E21C 27/24 (2006.01); E21D 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/1086 (2013.01); E21C 27/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923356A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923356 A1 19990514; AT 220760 T 20020815; AT 407421 B 20010326; AT A186597 A 20000715; AU 1135299 A 19990524; AU 744239 B2 20020221; DE 59804836 D1 20020822; EP 1029150 A1 20000823; EP 1029150 B1 20020717; PL 189331 B1 20050729; PL 340382 A1 20010129; ZA 9810055 B 19990505

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141103

2015-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 220760

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20141103

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59804836

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804836

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-22

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 220760

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011129

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI