Global Patent Index - EP 1029152 A1

EP 1029152 A1 2000-08-23 - CUTTING MACHINE

Title (en)

CUTTING MACHINE

Title (de)

SCHRÄMMASCHINE

Title (fr)

HAVEUSE

Publication

EP 1029152 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951091 A

Priority

  • AT 9800269 W
  • AT 186697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923358A1] The invention relates to a cutting machine (2), comprising cutting or shearing tools (19) which are mounted in such a way that they can rotate, a loading ramp and a conveyor (4) for receiving and removing the cut or shorn material, said conveyor running in the direction of the working face. According to the invention, the cutting or shearing tools (19) are mounted on a carriage which moves on guides extending in the longitudinal direction of the machine. Said guides are formed by pipes or bars which are connected to an engine frame in the area of the tracklaying gear (1), preferably within the frame of the tracklaying gear (1). The carriage is formed by longitudinal spars (10) and a crossbeam (9) for mounting the cutting or shearing tools (19). The machine frame has a box shape (3) at least in the front area adjacent to the crossbeam (9) and the conveyor is guided in the inner width of this box shape in such a way that it can move in the longitudinal direction of the machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 20/02; E21C 27/24; E21D 9/10; E21D 15/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21C 27/24 (2006.01); E21D 9/10 (2006.01); E21D 15/58 (2006.01); E21D 20/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21C 27/24 (2013.01); E21D 9/1026 (2013.01); E21D 15/58 (2013.01); E21D 20/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923358A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923358 A1 19990514; AT 212693 T 20020215; AT 407422 B 20010326; AT A186697 A 20000715; AU 744934 B2 20020307; AU 9727598 A 19990524; DE 59802986 D1 20020314; EP 1029152 A1 20000823; EP 1029152 B1 20020130; PL 187813 B1 20041029; PL 340410 A1 20010129; US 6428109 B1 20020806; ZA 9810053 B 19990505

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141103

2015-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 212693

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20141103

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59802986

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-01-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802986

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-14

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 212693

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI