Global patent index - EP 1029154 A1

EP 1029154 A1 2000-08-23 - TURBINE HOUSING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

TURBINE HOUSING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

TURBINENGEHÄUSE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

CARTER DE TURBINE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1029154 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961038 A

Priority

  • DE 9803122 W
  • DE 19748540 A
  • DE 19819508 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923359A1] The aim of the invention is to provide a turbine housing which is capable of withstanding extreme steam conditions. To this end, the inventive turbine housing (10) has a multilayered housing wall (16), an intermediate layer (22) in the form of a bed of non-metallic material (S), preferably sand, being provided between an inner layer (20) and an outer layer (24). According to the inventive method for producing the multilayered turbine housing (10), a core (104b) representing the intermediate layer (22) is placed in a casting mould (100, 100'), a hollow space (120, 121) being formed for the inner layer (20) or the outer layer (24). The hollow space (120, 121) is then filled with a casting material (G), the core (104b) remaining in the housing wall (16) as an intermediate layer (22). Alternatively, a U-shaped profile (106') is produced first and the intermediate space (122) formed by the outer layer (24) and the inner layer (20) is then filled with the bed material (S).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/14; F01D 25/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/24 (2006.01); F01D 25/00 (2006.01); F01D 25/14 (2006.01); F01D 25/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/10 (2013.01); F01D 25/145 (2013.01); F01D 25/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923359A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923359 A1 19990514; CN 1119507 C 20030827; CN 1277652 A 20001220; EP 1029154 A1 20000823; EP 1029154 B1 20030402; JP 2001522013 A 20011113; JP 4234904 B2 20090304; US 6315520 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141021

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141021

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59807765

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-05-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131015

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131014

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121216

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807765

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020307

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI