Global patent index - EP 1029157 A1

EP 1029157 A1 2000-08-23 - VALVE CONTROL DEVICE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

VALVE CONTROL DEVICE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VENTILSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE VALVE DESTINE A UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1029157 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99914421 A

Priority

  • DE 9900423 W
  • DE 19826046 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19826046A1] The invention relates to a valve control device for an internal combustion engine, comprising a gas exchange valve (1) for controlling an input and/or output section (13) of the combustion chamber in said internal combustion engine. Said section comprises an axially mobile gas exchange valve means (3) which has a valve rod (15) coupled to a differential piston (18) hydraulically operated via a piston rod (16). Said differential piston (18) is provided with two parts disposed in such a way that they are actively linked in axial direction and can move radially relatively to each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966177A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19826046 A1 19991216; EP 1029157 A1 20000823; EP 1029157 B1 20030910; JP 2002518624 A 20020625; JP 4395259 B2 20100106; KR 100570913 B1 20060414; US 6178935 B1 20010130; WO 9966177 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906944

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-10-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050213

2005-02-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040202

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906944

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT