Global patent index - EP 1029168 A2

EP 1029168 A2 2000-08-23 - PROCESS FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, IN PARTICULAR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, IN PARTICULAR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE INSBESONDERE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'EXPLOITATION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE, EN PARTICULIER, DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1029168 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98961063 A

Priority

  • DE 9803193 W
  • DE 19748745 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19748745A1] An internal combustion engine (1), in particular for a motor vehicle, is provided with a controller for controlling and/or regulating the output from the internal combustion engine (1) depending on operating parameters of the same, and in particular on the driver's wishes. The controller can determine an admissible output alteration during a predetermined period of time and an actual output alteration during a corresponding predetermined period of time (6, 7) and compare them with each other (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 41/187 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1004 (2013.01); F02D 2250/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924705A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19748745 A1 19990520; EP 1029168 A2 20000823; EP 1029168 B1 20020508; JP 2001522966 A 20011120; US 6474299 B1 20021105; WO 9924705 A2 19990520; WO 9924705 A3 19990805

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141102

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141102

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-09-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804085

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-13

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB