Global Patent Index - EP 1029172 A1

EP 1029172 A1 2000-08-23 - VALVE CONTROL UNIT FOR A FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

VALVE CONTROL UNIT FOR A FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

VENTILSTEUEREINHEIT FÜR EIN KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

UNITE DE COMMANDE DE VALVE DESTINEE A UNE VALVE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1029172 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919056 A

Priority

  • DE 9900641 W
  • DE 19826791 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19826791A1] The invention relates to a valve control unit (1) for a fuel injection valve, comprising two interconnected valve control compartments (3, 4). An end member (6) of a mobile valve control piston (5) can move in the first compartment (3) which is connected to an input channel (18). The second valve control compartment (4) is connected to a pluggable output channel (21). Said end member (6) is composed of an internal component (7) and an external component which can move relatively to each other. When the valve control piston moves, only the external component (8) moves to perform pre-injection and only the internal component (7) moves to perform main injection. The quantity of pre-injected fuel can be further minimised while simultaneously allowing an increase in the displacement speed of the valve control piston (5) during main injection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 45/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 45/08 (2013.01); F02M 2200/505 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966193A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19826791 A1 19991223; CN 1158456 C 20040721; CN 1272163 A 20001101; CZ 20000116 A3 20010117; CZ 293709 B6 20040714; EP 1029172 A1 20000823; EP 1029172 B1 20030903; JP 2002518630 A 20020625; US 6244245 B1 20010612; WO 9966193 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906857

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906857

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130310

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130310

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130310

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906857 P 20031009

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020808

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT