Global Patent Index - EP 1029173 A1

EP 1029173 A1 2000-08-23 - VALVE CONTROL UNIT FOR A FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

VALVE CONTROL UNIT FOR A FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

VENTILSTEUEREINHEIT FÜR EIN KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

UNITE DE COMMANDE POUR SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1029173 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936421 A

Priority

  • DE 9901661 W
  • DE 19826719 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19826719A1] The invention relates to a valve control unit (1) for a fuel injection valve, comprising two communicating valve control chambers (5, 8). The end member (13) of a valve control piston (3) that may be impinged upon with pressure is located inside the first valve control chamber (5) that is connected to a supply channel (6). Said member can be displaced in such a way that the flow cross section for fuel exchange may be shifted from the first valve control chamber (5) to the second valve control chamber (8) that is connected to a drain channel (9). A throttle channel (17) for fuel exchange between the valve control chambers (5, 8) is embodied in the end member (13) of the valve control piston (3). Due to the configuration of the throttle channel (17), mechanical stop of the end member (13) of the valve control piston (3) is made possible on the edge areas of the passage between the valve control chambers (5, 8). The stop makes it possible to enlarge the volume of the first valve control chamber (5), said volume enlargement having no negative effect on the performance of the stop of the end member (13). Increased reaction speed of the valve control piston (3) after conclusion of the injection process can be obtained as final result of these constructional measures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 2547/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966192A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19826719 A1 19991223; EP 1029173 A1 20000823; EP 1029173 B1 20031008; JP 2002518629 A 20020625; WO 9966192 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110923

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2005-06-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040608

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-06-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040608

2004-02-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040123

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907284 P 20031113

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020918

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT