Global Patent Index - EP 1029196 A1

EP 1029196 A1 2000-08-23 - TERMINAL ADAPTER, ESPECIALLY FOR QUICK TEST CONNECTIONS

Title (en)

TERMINAL ADAPTER, ESPECIALLY FOR QUICK TEST CONNECTIONS

Title (de)

ANSCHLUSSADAPTER, INSBESONDERE FÜR PRÜFSCHNELLANSCHLÜSSE

Title (fr)

ADAPTATEUR, EN PARTICULIER POUR RACCORDS DE TEST RAPIDE

Publication

EP 1029196 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963438 A

Priority

  • DE 29719856 U
  • EP 9807184 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6454309B1] A connector adapter includes an embracing holder and a connector piston. The connector piston sleeve is axially movable relative to the embracing holder by an actuating device and bears against a mating connector in sealed manner in a connected position. A backing plate supports the mating connector and is interchangeably attached to the connector adapter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 13/00; F17C 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16L 21/06 (2006.01); F17C 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/04 (2013.01); F17C 2205/037 (2013.01); F17C 2209/228 (2013.01); Y10S 285/90 (2013.01); Y10S 285/92 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924754A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29719856 U1 19981210; EP 1029196 A1 20000823; EP 1029196 B1 20030709; ES 2202926 T3 20040401; JP 2001522977 A 20011120; JP 4064057 B2 20080319; US 6454309 B1 20020924; WO 9924754 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161110

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808998

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151104

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150916

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202926 T3

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808998 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT