Global Patent Index - EP 1029197 A1

EP 1029197 A1 2000-08-23 - LIGHT FIXTURE APPARATUS WITH AUXILIARY LIGHT

Title (en)

LIGHT FIXTURE APPARATUS WITH AUXILIARY LIGHT

Title (de)

BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT ZUSATZLEUCHTE

Title (fr)

LUMINAIRE AVEC LAMPE AUXILIAIRE

Publication

EP 1029197 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98957848 A

Priority

  • US 9824112 W
  • US 6569597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9926017A1] A light fixture apparatus includes a support frame (10) mounted to the wall and an auxiliary or examination light source (40) coupled to the support frame (10) and movable from a first stored position to a second deployed position. A first switch (32) in series with the auxiliary light source (40) is opened when the auxiliary light (40) is in the stored position and closed when the auxiliary light (40) is in the deployed position. The light source (40) has three degrees of adjustment. The light source (40) is connected to one end of telescopic members (60) which are pivotally connected at its second end to the support frame (10) to pivot about an axis transverse the telescoping axis. A safety switch (110) is provided adjacent the telescopic members to sense the pivoting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/00; F21V 21/22; F21V 25/04; F21V 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/22 (2006.01); F21V 25/04 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 33/0068 (2013.01); F21S 8/033 (2013.01); F21V 21/22 (2013.01); F21V 21/30 (2013.01); F21V 25/10 (2013.01); F21V 25/04 (2013.01); F21V 29/02 (2013.01); F21V 29/67 (2013.01); F21W 2131/208 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9926017 A1 19990527; AT 263333 T 20040415; AU 1400899 A 19990607; CA 2310082 A1 19990527; CA 2310082 C 20050118; DE 69822865 D1 20040506; DE 69822865 T2 20050203; EP 1029197 A1 20000823; EP 1029197 B1 20040331; JP 2001523881 A 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051112

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051112

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041230

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-11-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041103

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69822865 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21S 8/00 A

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 21/22 B

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 25/04 B

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 33/00 B

2003-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HILL-ROM SERVICES, INC.

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021025

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL