Global Patent Index - EP 1029206 A1

EP 1029206 A1 2000-08-23 - SOLAR COLLECTOR

Title (en)

SOLAR COLLECTOR

Title (de)

SONNENKOLLEKTOR

Title (fr)

CAPTEUR SOLAIRE

Publication

EP 1029206 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98942444 A

Priority

  • CH 9800403 W
  • CH 220197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914536A1] The invention relates to a solar collector device, comprising several solar collector modules, each solar collector module having an attachment unit (2) for attaching the solar collector module on or in the surface of a building, preferably the surface of a roof or a facade, and an active collector unit (3) with at least one heat collector (30). The purpose of said heat collector is to heat a heat carrier medium using solar radiation, said heat carrier medium flowing through the collector unit (3). The solar collector modules can be arranged in rows (I, II, III) which are positioned one above the other and staggered along the surface of the building. Each solar collector module comprises a support panel (1), a top section of said support panel forming the attachment unit (2) and at least one heat collector (30) being located on the bottom section of the support panel (1).The attachment unit (2) can be covered by the active collector units (3) of the adjacent solar collector modules situated in a row above. Each active collector unit (3) has connections (33, 34) which can be plugged together with connections (33, 34) of the active collector units (3) of adjacent solar collector modules of the rows above and below (II, III) to form tight connection lines to said adjacent collector units (3). In this way, the solar collector modules are arranged in the roof or facade surface in place of tiles, in such a way that they overlap in the manner of shingle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24J 2/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24J 2/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24J 2/0455 (2013.01); H02S 20/23 (2014.12); H02S 40/44 (2014.12); Y02B 10/12 (2013.01); Y02B 10/20 (2013.01); Y02B 10/70 (2013.01); Y02E 10/44 (2013.01); Y02E 10/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914536A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914536 A1 19990325; AU 9059898 A 19990405; CA 2311287 A1 19990325; EP 1029206 A1 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-26 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTERCASE HOLDING

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010508

2001-03-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE