Global patent index - EP 1029212 A4

EP 1029212 A4 2000-11-15 - CHARGING APPARATUS FOR A ROTARY HEARTH FURNACE

Title (en)

CHARGING APPARATUS FOR A ROTARY HEARTH FURNACE

Title (de)

CHARGIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR DREHROHROFEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE CHARGEMENT POUR FOUR A SOLE ROTATIF

Publication

EP 1029212 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98940916 A

Priority

  • US 9816968 W
  • US 94957297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919681A1] An apparatus (10) for charging a feed material (12) onto a rotating hearth (16) of a rotary hearth furnace (14), the rotary hearth furnace including refractory lined inner and outer walls and having a refractory roof supported thereon, the apparatus comprising a table (18) mounted above the rotating hearth and capable of receiving feed material from outside of the rotary hearth furnace, the table extends transversely across the rotating hearth and having a first end (24) including a distribution member (32), a second end (26) including a plurality of discharge slots (38), and an intermediate leveling plow (34); wherein feed material free falls over said distribution member and is distributed across the width of the table and then adjusted to a uniform depth such that as the rotating hearth passes under the stationary table a curtain of feed material is loaded onto the hearth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 9/16; B65G 69/04; F27B 9/38; F27D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 47/19 (2006.01); F27B 9/16 (2006.01); F27B 9/38 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 9/38 (2013.01); F27D 3/0033 (2013.01); F27B 9/16 (2013.01); F27D 2003/0008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919681 A1 19990422; AU 738633 B2 20010920; AU 8908298 A 19990503; CA 2306088 A1 19990422; DE 69821517 D1 20040311; DE 69821517 T2 20040930; EP 1029212 A1 20000823; EP 1029212 A4 20001115; EP 1029212 B1 20040204; JP 2001520364 A 20011030; US 5895215 A 19990420

INPADOC legal status

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100814

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69821517

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100814

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69821517

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010315

2000-11-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 27B 9/16 A, 7F 27D 3/00 B, 7B 65G 69/04 B, 7F 27B 9/38 B

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB