Global Patent Index - EP 1029217 A1

EP 1029217 A1 2000-08-23 - PROJECTILE STOPPING DEVICE

Title (en)

PROJECTILE STOPPING DEVICE

Title (de)

GESCHOSSFANGEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ARRET DE PROJECTILES

Publication

EP 1029217 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963432 A

Priority

  • DE 19749881 A
  • DE 19841901 A
  • EP 9807154 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924775A1] The invention relates to a projectile stopping device provided for dampening the noise resulting from the impact of projectiles, for slowing the projectiles and for simplifying the recovery of the same. The individual stopping curtains (27 to 29), said curtains being distanced from one another in a direction (1) of fire, of the inventive device are comprised of suspended steel cables. The stopping cables (26) are accommodated in upper and lower sides of similarly composed receiving devices and are connected to guides (32), said guides also being similarly composed, via the receiving devices. The fastening of stopping cables on said guides and the arrangement thereof inside a curtain are designed in such a way that, in the case of a deviation, each stopping cable is always subjected to a restoring force which carries the stopping cable back to its initial position. The projectiles inside a firing range which impact on stopping curtains, said curtains being produced according to the invention, cause the steel cables to deviate both in the planes of the individual stopping curtains as well as vertical to the stopping curtains. After having been slowed, the projectiles can be caught on both sides and delivered to an arranged collector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41J 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41J 13/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41J 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924775A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924775 A1 19990520; AT 221643 T 20020815; EP 1029217 A1 20000823; EP 1029217 B1 20020731; US 6526861 B1 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071110

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071110

2006-11-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-05-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050504

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2003-01-06 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021110

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805039 20020905

2002-08-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221643 T 20020815

2002-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRUBER, HEINZ

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUBER, HEINZ

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010529

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL