Global Patent Index - EP 1029237 A1

EP 1029237 A1 2000-08-23 - PROBE FOR EDDY CURRENT TESTING, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PROBE FOR EDDY CURRENT TESTING AND METHOD FOR EDDY CURRENT TESTING

Title (en)

PROBE FOR EDDY CURRENT TESTING, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PROBE FOR EDDY CURRENT TESTING AND METHOD FOR EDDY CURRENT TESTING

Title (de)

TASTKOPF ZUR WIRBELSTROMPRÜFUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TASTKOPFES FÜR EINE WIRBELSTROMPRÜFUNG UND WIRBELSTROMPRÜFVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PALPEUR POUR ESSAI PAR COURANTS DE FOUCAULT, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN PALPEUR POUR ESSAI PAR COURANTS DE FOUCAULT, ET PROCEDE D'ESSAI PAR COURANTS DE FOUCAULT

Publication

EP 1029237 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962175 A

Priority

  • DE 9803108 W
  • DE 19748551 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923484A1] The invention relates to an Eddy current testing probe (1). According to the invention, a probe coil arrangement (7) is positioned on a film (4) on a film support (8). Said film support (8) is adapted to the shape of the object to be tested. This enables the test to be carried out quickly and with little disturbance. The invention also relates to a method for producing an Eddy current testing probe (1) and to an Eddy current testing method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/9033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923484A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923484 A1 19990514; EP 1029237 A1 20000823; JP 2001522046 A 20011113; US 6452384 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031125

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BECKER, ERICH

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOHMANN, HANS-PETER

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAALMANS, GABRIEL

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LUDWIG, KLAUS

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAER, LUDWIG

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI