Global patent index - EP 1029295 A2

EP 1029295 A2 2000-08-23 - IMPROVEMENTS IN, OR RELATING TO, ELECTRONIC PAYMENT SYSTEMS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN, OR RELATING TO, ELECTRONIC PAYMENT SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN IN BZW. IM BEZUG AUF ELEKTRONISCHE ZAHLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS CONCERNANT DES SYSTEMES DE PAIEMENT ELECTRONIQUE

Publication

EP 1029295 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98954892 A

Priority

  • SE 9802002 W
  • SE 9704078 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9924921A2] The electronic payment system handles financial settlement of transactions, between consumers and merchants, relating to products/services purchased by the consumers from the merchants via an electronic trading medium, such as the Internet, and is supported by a telecommunication architecture adapted to provide a plurality of electronic payment schemes. Each one which is indigenous to a different country and adapted to operate, nationally, as a single-scheme, independently of the other schemes, in accordance with a common set of rules. Each payment scheme has an electronic account, owned and controlled by an operator of the scheme. An inter-scheme conversion and cross-currency exchange facility is provided for the electronic payment schemes which enables merchants subscribing to each of the national schemes to trade with subscribing consumers, irrespective of the payment scheme to which the consumers subscribers, or the consumer's unit of account and currency. Each of the scheme-specific electronic accounts is adapted to receive payments from a subscribing consumer, for products/services purchased from a merchant, in the consumer's currency, and to make corresponding payments to a scheme-specific electronic account, to which said merchant subscribers, in a currency selected by said merchant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30; G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924921A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9924921 A2 19990520; WO 9924921 A3 19990805; EP 1029295 A2 20000823; SE 9704078 D0 19971107; SE 9704078 L 19990508

INPADOC legal status

2008-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080508

2008-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071228

2007-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELIASONERA AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHRISTENSEN, MARIA

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ISAKSSON, LENNART

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000607;LV PAYMENT 20000607