Global Patent Index - EP 1029307 A1

EP 1029307 A1 2000-08-23 - CASH DRAWER FOR AN AUTOMATIC TELLER

Title (en)

CASH DRAWER FOR AN AUTOMATIC TELLER

Title (de)

AUSGABEFACH FÜR EINEN GELDAUSGABE-/-EINGABEAUTOMATEN

Title (fr)

TIROIR-CAISSE DE GUICHET AUTOMATIQUE

Publication

EP 1029307 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951274 A

Priority

  • DE 9802646 W
  • DE 19748864 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19748864A1] A cash drawer for an automatic teller has a bottom (26) and an opening for cash withdrawal that can be closed by a closing flap (16). The cash drawer is designed as a module which can be inserted into the automatic teller and comprises a frame (10) provided with the opening for cash withdrawal, a closing flap (16) arranged thereon and movable between an open position in which the opening for cash withdrawal is cleared and a closed position in which the opening for cash withdrawal is closed, the bottom (26), a stacking device (100) for depositing bank notes on the bottom (26), a separating device (38) for drawing bank notes from the bottom (26), a first path of transport (72, 80, 90) for conveying bank notes from a first connection point of the module to the stacking device (100), a second path of transport (101, 90, 80) for conveying bank notes from a second connection point (105) of the module to the stacking device (100) and a third path of transport (56) for conveying bank notes from the separating device (38) to the first connection point (68).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924939A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19748864 A1 19990506; EP 1029307 A1 20000823; EP 1029307 B1 20020313; US 6276678 B1 20010821; WO 9924939 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110908

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090908

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090908

2010-05-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-03-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-10-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803372 20020418

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010718

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE