Global Patent Index - EP 1029334 A1

EP 1029334 A1 2000-08-23 - STARTING SWITCH COMPRISING A FIXED MAGNETIC CORE IN SEVERAL PARTS

Title (en)

STARTING SWITCH COMPRISING A FIXED MAGNETIC CORE IN SEVERAL PARTS

Title (de)

ANLASSER-SCHÜTZ MIT MEHRTEILIGEN MAGNETKERN

Title (fr)

CONTACTEUR DE DEMARREUR COMPORTANT UN NOYAU MAGNETIQUE FIXE EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES

Publication

EP 1029334 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99941683 A

Priority

  • FR 9902100 W
  • FR 9811121 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2783089A1] The invention concerns a motor vehicle starting switch comprising a mobile magnetic core moving axially by the effect of a magnetic field generated by a coil, and comprising a fixed magnetic core (26) extending transversely to one axial front end of the winding, wherein the fixed core (26) comprises a rear shank (28) which is axially received in the coil and which comprises an axial perforation (44) for allowing through a mobile contact rod, and wherein the fixed core (26) comprises a front ring-shaped disc (30), assembled with the rear shank (26), and mounted in a cylindrical housing of the starter. The invention is characterised in that the front disc (30) consists of a sheet metal stack (32).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 49/00 (2006.01); H01H 50/02 (2006.01); H01H 50/16 (2006.01); H01H 50/36 (2006.01); H01H 51/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0014758A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2783089 A1 20000310; FR 2783089 B1 20001013; BR 9906759 A 20000926; BR 9906759 B1 20130219; DE 69933430 D1 20061116; DE 69933430 T2 20070111; EP 1029334 A1 20000823; EP 1029334 B1 20061004; JP 2002524826 A 20020806; US 6281770 B1 20010828; WO 0014758 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170911

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070705

2007-05-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20061004

2007-01-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070115

2006-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69933430 P 20061116

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2006-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050502

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE