Global Patent Index - EP 1029335 A1

EP 1029335 A1 2000-08-23 - STARTING SWITCH WITH MOBILE CORE COMPRISING A DIRECTLY MOUNTED CLOSURE CUP

Title (en)

STARTING SWITCH WITH MOBILE CORE COMPRISING A DIRECTLY MOUNTED CLOSURE CUP

Title (de)

ANLASSER-SCHÜTZ MIT AUFGESETZTEN VERSCHLUSSTELLER

Title (fr)

CONTACTEUR DE DEMARREUR A NOYAU MOBILE COMPORTANT UNE COUPELLE RAPPORTEE DE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 1029335 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99941684 A

Priority

  • FR 9902101 W
  • FR 9811122 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2783090A1] The invention concerns a heat engine starting switch comprising a coil, in a bore wherein slides a magnetic core (32), of the type wherein an outer return spring (58) presses axially against a directly mounted external flange (56) of the core (32), and wherein an internal bore (36) of the core (32) emerges at its rear end (52) to form a rear shoulder surface (42) supporting an inner return spring (38) of a link rod of a lever actuating a driving pinion, which rod (26) passes through the rear end (52) of the core (32), and is capable of pressing against a front base (48) of the bore (36) to be driven by the core (32). The invention is characterised in that the front base (48) is made in one piece with the core (36), and a cup (54) directly mounted at the rear end (52) comprises the rear shoulder surface (42) of the bore (36) and the external flange (56).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/06 (2006.01); F02N 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 50/20 (2006.01); H01H 51/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0014759A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2783090 A1 20000310; FR 2783090 B1 20001013; BR 9906986 A 20000926; BR 9906986 B1 20130528; DE 69928072 D1 20051208; DE 69928072 T2 20060720; EP 1029335 A1 20000823; EP 1029335 B1 20051102; ES 2249912 T3 20060401; JP 2002524689 A 20020806; JP 4376462 B2 20091202; US 6307454 B1 20011023; WO 0014759 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160929

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160909

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-10-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2249912 T3

2006-02-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060118

2005-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69928072 P 20051208

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-11-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE