Global patent index - EP 1029346 A1

EP 1029346 A1 2000-08-23 - VERTICAL INTERCONNECT PROCESS FOR SILICON SEGMENTS WITH THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE EPOXY PREFORM

Title (en)

VERTICAL INTERCONNECT PROCESS FOR SILICON SEGMENTS WITH THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE EPOXY PREFORM

Title (de)

VERTIKALES VERBINDUNGSPROZESS FÜR SILIZIUMSEGMENTE MIT THERMISCH-LEITENDEN EPOXYFORMTEILEN

Title (fr)

PROCESSUS D'INTERCONNEXION VERTICALE DE SEGMENTS DE SILICIUM ET D'UNE PREFORME DE COLLE EPOXY THERMOCONDUCTRICE

Publication

EP 1029346 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98943211 A

Priority

  • US 9816901 W
  • US 91850197 A
  • US 91850297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910925A1] An apparatus for vertically interconnecting stacks of silicon segments. Each segment includes a plurality of adjacent die on a semiconductor wafer. The plurality of die on a segment are interconnected on the segment using one or more layers of metal interconnects which extend to all four sides of the segment to provide edge bonding pads for external electrical connection points. After the die are interconnected, each segment is cut from the backside of the wafer using a bevel cut to provide four inwardly sloping edge walls on each of the segments. After the segments are cut from the wafer, the segments are placed on top of one another to form a stack. Vertically adjacent segments in the stack are electrically interconnected by applying electrically conductive epoxy to one or more sides of the stack. The inwardly sloping edge walls of each of the segments in the stack provide a recess which allows the electrically conductive epoxy to access the edge bonding pads and lateral circuits on each of the segments once the segments are stacked. A thermally conductive epoxy preform is provided between the stack of segments so that the stack of segments are epoxied together. In one embodiment, the thermally conductive epoxy preform includes a plurality of glass spheres randomly distributed within the preform to maintain a distance between the stack of segments.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/44; H01L 21/48; H01L 21/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 25/18 (2006.01); H01L 21/98 (2006.01); H01L 23/373 (2006.01); H01L 23/52 (2006.01); H01L 25/065 (2006.01); H01L 25/07 (2006.01); H01L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 25/50 (2013.01); H01L 23/3737 (2013.01); H01L 25/0657 (2013.01); H01L 29/0657 (2013.01); H01L 2224/24145 (2013.01); H01L 2224/2919 (2013.01); H01L 2224/29399 (2013.01); H01L 2225/06524 (2013.01); H01L 2225/06527 (2013.01); H01L 2225/06551 (2013.01); H01L 2225/06555 (2013.01); H01L 2225/06593 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01021 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01022 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01074 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01079 (2013.01); H01L 2924/14 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2224/2919 + H01L 2924/0665 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910925 A1 19990304; AU 9105298 A 19990316; EP 1029346 A1 20000823; EP 1029346 A4 20060118; JP 2001514449 A 20010911

INPADOC legal status

2009-04-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20081104

2008-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080421

2006-01-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20051206

2002-07-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VERTICAL CIRCUITS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VERTICAL CIRCUITS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE