Global Patent Index - EP 1029387 A1

EP 1029387 A1 2000-08-23 - CRIMPING TOOL

Title (en)

CRIMPING TOOL

Title (de)

CRIMPWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

OUTIL DE SERTISSAGE

Publication

EP 1029387 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965073 A

Priority

  • DE 9803349 W
  • DE 19749260 A
  • DE 19750770 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9925045A1] A crimping tool for crimping crimp contacts, especially crimp contacts in the form of a strip, comprising a base body with a pressing device and a table (4) allocated to said base body and enabling the crimp contacts to be guided. The crimp contacts are conducted to the pressing device via the table (4).The position of the table (4) in relation to the base body can be modified along a guide. In order to position the crimp contacts in a precise, variable and simple manner, the inventive crimping tool is embodied in such a way that it is provided with a controlling unit (6) for continuously variable positioning of the table (4) along said guide (5). In another embodiment, the position of the table (4) in relation to the base body (3) can be optionally and variably adjusted along the guide, whereby the table (4) comprises a positioning device (22) for functional positioning of the crimp contacts (1) in relation to the table (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/048; H01R 43/055

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/048 (2006.01); H01R 43/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/048 (2013.01); H01R 43/055 (2013.01); Y10S 72/712 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49185 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53235 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925045A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9925045 A1 19990520; EP 1029387 A1 20000823; EP 1029387 B1 20020213; US 6298707 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031118

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-08-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803090 20020321

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-02-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000527

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT