Global Patent Index - EP 1029402 A1

EP 1029402 A1 2000-08-23 - SYSTEM FOR DISTRIBUTING PERSONALIZED AUDIO PROGRAMMING

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR DISTRIBUTING PERSONALIZED AUDIO PROGRAMMING

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE VERTEILUNG VON PERSONALISIERTEN TONPROGRAMMEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE DISTRIBUER DES PROGRAMMES AUDIO PERSONNALISES

Publication

EP 1029402 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98907577 A

Priority

US 9803444 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943111A1] An audio program and message distribution system in which a host system organizes and transmits program segments to client subscriber locations. The host organizes the program segments by subject matter and creates scheduled programming in accordance with preferences associated with each subscriber. Program segments are associated with descriptive subject matter segments, and the subject matter segments may be used to generate both text and audio cataloging presentations to enable the user to more easily identify and select desirable programming. A playback unit at the subscriber location reproduces the program segments received from the host and includes mechanisms for interactively navigating among the program segments. A usage log is compiled to record the subscriber's use of the provided program materials, to return data to the host for billing, to adaptatively modify the subscriber's reference based on actual usage, and to send subscriber-generated comments and requests to the host for processing. Voice input and control mechanisms included in the player allow the user to perform hands-free navigation of the program materials and to dictate comments and messages which are returned to the host for retransmissions to other subscribers. The program segments sent to each subscriber may include advertising materials which the user can selectively play to obtain credits against the subscriber fee. Parallel audio and text transcript files for at least selected programming enable subject matter searching and synchronization of the audio and text files. Speech synthesis may be used to convert transcript files into audio format. Image files may also be transmitted from the server for synchronized playback with the audio programming.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/38 (2008.01); H04H 60/46 (2008.01); H04H 60/82 (2008.01); H04H 60/52 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/82 (2013.01); H04H 20/38 (2013.01); H04H 60/46 (2013.01); H04H 60/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943111A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943111 A1 19990826; AU 6334698 A 19990906; EP 1029402 A1 20000823; EP 2290972 A2 20110302

INPADOC legal status


2011-01-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101217

2011-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PERSONAL AUDIO LLC

2011-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOGAN, JAMES D.

2011-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOESSLING, DANIEL, F.

2011-01-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CALL, CHARLES, G.

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040507

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOGAN, JAMES

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOESSLING, DANIEL, F.

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CALL, CHARLES, G.

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB