Global Patent Index - EP 1029461 A2

EP 1029461 A2 2000-08-23 - Filter material for reducing harmful substances in tobacco smoke

Title (en)

Filter material for reducing harmful substances in tobacco smoke

Title (de)

Filtermaterial zur Reduzierung von Schadstoffen im Tabakrauch

Title (fr)

Matériau filtrant pour réduire les substances nocives dans la fumée de tabac

Publication

EP 1029461 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101831 A

Priority

DE 19906549 A

Abstract (en)

Filter is made of a material consisting of marble, activated charcoal, porous clay and/or zeolite.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Filter zur Reduzierung von Schadstoffen im Tabakrauch beschrieben. Das Filtermaterial ist aus wenigstens drei der Stoffe Marmor, Aktivkohle, poröser Ton oder Zeolith zusammengesetzt. Der Filter ist für Tabakerzeugnisse wie Zigaretten, Zigarren oder Zigarillos und für Rauchhilfsmittel wie Tabakpfeifen, Zigaretten- und Zigarrenspitzen geeignet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/10 (2006.01); A24D 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/10 (2013.01); A24D 3/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029461 A2 20000823; EP 1029461 A3 20010613; CN 1267488 A 20000927; JP 2000236864 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040803

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 24D 3/06 A, 7A 24D 3/10 B, 7A 24D 3/16 B

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI