Global Patent Index - EP 1029475 A3

EP 1029475 A3 2001-02-28 - Dispensing apparatus

Title (en)

Dispensing apparatus

Title (de)

Abgabevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif distributeur

Publication

EP 1029475 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00301282 A

Priority

GB 9903791 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1029475A2] A display assembly 2 includes a substantially planar base member 4 which is inclined and held in position by suitable means. An elongate support rail 6 is secured to the base member 4 at a front end thereof. The support rail is arranged to pivotally and releasably engage a plurality of upwardly extending support members 8 which releasably engage respective side pieces 10. Respective elongate channels 12 are defined by the base member 4 and a pair of adjacent side pieces 10, within which channels a stack of products (not shown) may be arranged. A carriage device 14 is arranged behind the stack of products and is arranged to move forward under gravity to shunt the products forward in the channels when products are removed from the front end thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 1/12; A47F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 1/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029475 A2 20000823; EP 1029475 A3 20010228; GB 2346874 A 20000823; GB 9903791 D0 19990414

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010829

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI