Global Patent Index - EP 1029477 A1

EP 1029477 A1 2000-08-23 - Device to distribute air in glass-fronted cabinets and display counters

Title (en)

Device to distribute air in glass-fronted cabinets and display counters

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Luftverteilung für Verkaufstheken und Vitrinen mit Glasvorderwänden

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour distribuer un flux d'air dans une vitrine à paroi frontale vitrée et dans un comptoir de présentation

Publication

EP 1029477 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00102849 A

Priority

IT UD990036 A

Abstract (en)

Device to distribute air for glass-fronted cabinets, counters, or in general containers which are refrigerated, heated or otherwise climatically conditioned, said containers (10) comprising a compartment (15) defining a volume containing the foodstuffs to be conserved, and possibly one or more overlying levels to contain the products facing the customer's side, said containers (10) also comprising a technical compartment (16) inside which the ventilation unit (22) and the thermal conditioning unit (30) are housed, said containers (10) comprising at least a transparent front element (20) facing the customer's side, the device comprising a conveyor element (25) transparent and substantially invisible arranged inside the compartment (15) and able to define, together with said transparent front element (20), an air-conveyor channel (26) which affects at least part of said transparent front element (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/0413 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029477 A1 20000823; IT 1310536 B1 20020218; IT UD990036 A1 20000821

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021212

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI