Global Patent Index - EP 1029480 A1

EP 1029480 A1 2000-08-23 - Sectional wall rail for mounting devices for display or goods

Title (en)

Sectional wall rail for mounting devices for display or goods

Title (de)

Profilierte Wandschiene zum Anbringen von Vorrichtungen zur Warenpräsentation

Title (fr)

Profilé mural pour le montage de dispositifs pour la présentation de biens

Publication

EP 1029480 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810148 A

Priority

EP 99810148 A

Abstract (en)

The profiled , wall-mounted rail (1) for supporting a device for displaying merchandise has recesses on its front side. Support arms (6) for merchandise are supported by the rail. Each arm consists of a rod (60) and a plate (61) which is releasably hooked into a recess in the rail. This is carried out by lifting the free end of the rod, pushing the upper edge of the plate into an upper channel behind the rail front, lowering the end of the rod and inserting the lower side of the plate into a lower interior channel, when it is held in place by lips built on to the two channels.

Abstract (de)

Die profilierte Wandschiene (1) ist zum horizontalen Anbringen an einer Rückwand (4) und zur Halterung verschiedener direkter und indirekter Warenträger (6) vorgesehen. Einsatzorte sind Geschäfte und Messestände. Die Warenträger (6) können innerhalb eines Rasters oder gänzlich frei wählbar eingehängt werden, nämlich entweder in einer Steckaufnahme oder in einer Nutenbahn (16). Zum Einhängen in der Nutenbahn (16) benutzt man eine Halteklammer oder Laufräder, an denen die Warenträger (6) befestigt sind. Ein in die Steckaufnahme einsetzbarer Warenträger (6) in Gestalt eines Tragarms weist ein Stangenteil (60) und vorn eine Steckplatte (61) auf. In der eingehängten Position steht die Steckplatte (61) hinter Prellkanten, welche von Hinterschneidungen gebildet werden. Mit der Wandschiene (1) eröffnen sich für den Laden- und Messebau originelle sowie effiziente Möglichkeiten der Warenpräsentation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 5/08; A47B 96/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/06 (2006.01); A47F 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/067 (2013.01); A47F 5/0853 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029480 A1 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010224

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VISPLAY IP AG

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI