Global Patent Index - EP 1029495 A2

EP 1029495 A2 2000-08-23 - Suction head for vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Suction head for vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Saugkopf für Bodenstaubsauger

Title (fr)

Tête aspirante pour aspirateur

Publication

EP 1029495 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124248 A

Priority

DE 29903009 U

Abstract (en)

The suction head has a substrate which is vertically adjustable in a housing upper member. The housing upper member has a suction channel that blends onto a suction mouth of a glide sole. The substrate has a sealing strip formed as an upholstered strip such as foam material.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Saugkopf für Bodenstaubsauger mit einem Gehäuseoberteil, das einen Saugkanal enthält, einer an das Gehäuseoberteil angeschlossenen Gleitsohle mit einem Saugmund, in den der Saugkanal einmündet, und einem im Gehäuseoberteil vertikal verstellbar angeordneten Träger. An der Unterseite des Trägers ist mindestens ein Dichtstreifen angeordnet, der bei einer Stellbewegung des Trägers durch einen bodenseitigen Schlitz ausfahrbar ist und auf das Gehäuseoberteil wirkende Kräfte überträgt. Erfindungsgemäß ist Dichtstreifen als Polsterleiste, z.B. aus Schaumstoff, einem faserigen Material, einem elastisch komprimierbaren Kunststoffhohlkörper u. dgl. ausgebildet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/06 (2013.01); A47L 9/066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903009 U1 19990506; EP 1029495 A2 20000823; EP 1029495 A3 20020918; EP 1029495 B1 20040728; HK 1029267 A1 20050114

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151207

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-01-14 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1029267

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910066

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI