Global Patent Index - EP 1029495 A3

EP 1029495 A3 2002-09-18 - Suction head for vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Suction head for vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Saugkopf für Bodenstaubsauger

Title (fr)

Tête aspirante pour aspirateur

Publication

EP 1029495 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99124248 A

Priority

DE 29903009 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1029495A2] The suction head has a substrate which is vertically adjustable in a housing upper member. The housing upper member has a suction channel that blends onto a suction mouth of a glide sole. The substrate has a sealing strip formed as an upholstered strip such as foam material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/06 (2013.01); A47L 9/066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903009 U1 19990506; EP 1029495 A2 20000823; EP 1029495 A3 20020918; EP 1029495 B1 20040728; HK 1029267 A1 20050114

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-01-14 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029267

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910066 P 20040902

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI