Global Patent Index - EP 1029496 A2

EP 1029496 A2 2000-08-23 - Household dishwasher

Title (en)

Household dishwasher

Title (de)

Haushalt-Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à laver la vaisselle à usage domestique

Publication

EP 1029496 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101981 A

Priority

DE 19907188 A

Abstract (en)

The dishwasher has at least two alternately supplied spraying devices or groups of devices that are supplied by at least one circulating pump with rinsing liquid for application to the items to be cleaned. The speed of the pump can be regulated, whereby the speed is reduced during a changeover from one sprayer or group off sprayers to another.

Abstract (de)

Um bei einer Haushalt-Geschirrspülmaschine mit wechselnder Beschickung von wenigstens zwei Sprüheinrichtungen bzw. Gruppen von Sprüheinrichtungen, die von einer Umwälzpumpe mit Spülflüssigkeit zur Beaufschlagung von zu reinigendem Gut beliefert werden beim Wechsel von einer Sprüheinrichtung bzw. einer Gruppe von Sprüheinrichtungen zu einer weiteren Sprüheinrichtung bzw. Gruppe von Sprüheinrichtungen auf einfache Art und Weise eine erhöhte Geräuschentwicklung zu vermeiden, ist erfindungsgemäß die Drehzahl der Umwälzpumpe regelbar, wobei während des Wechsels von einer Sprüheinrichtung bzw. einer Gruppe von Sprüheinrichtungen zu einer weiteren Sprüheinrichtung bzw. Gruppe von Sprüheinrichtungen die Drehzahl der Umwälzpumpe reduziert wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42; A47L 15/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/23 (2006.01); A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4221 (2013.01); A47L 15/0052 (2013.01); A47L 2501/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029496 A2 20000823; EP 1029496 A3 20001122; EP 1029496 B1 20060524; AT 326897 T 20060615; DE 19907188 A1 20000824; DE 50012795 D1 20060629; ES 2264913 T3 20070201

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012795

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-08-16 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-06-15 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20110405

2011-06-15 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20110405

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110226

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110301

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-04-05 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50012795

2011-04-05 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 50012795

2011-01-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ELECTROLUX ROTHENBURG GMBH FACTORY AND DEVELOPMENT

- Effective date: 20070210

2011-01-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. KG SCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAEGE

- Effective date: 20070221

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060825

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERATE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Effective date: 20070210

2007-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. KG SCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAEGE

- Effective date: 20070221

2007-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Effective date: 20070210

2007-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2264913 T3

2006-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-10-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061024

2006-09-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-08-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012795 P 20060629

2006-06-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050428

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI