Global Patent Index - EP 1029500 A2

EP 1029500 A2 2000-08-23 - Control panel for an electrical household appliance

Title (en)

Control panel for an electrical household appliance

Title (de)

Bedienblende für ein elektrisches Haushaltsgerät

Title (fr)

Panneau de commande pour appareil électroménager

Publication

EP 1029500 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124512 A

Priority

DE 29903008 U

Abstract (en)

The socket (29) is coupled to the panel wall facing the operator by means of thin-walled connections. The screw and/or locking element(s) (25, 27) couple the operating and/or display components to the inside of the panel wall (19) and the components are aligned by means of the centering component (21).

Abstract (de)

Es ist Aufgabe der Erfindung, eine Bedienblende für ein elektrisches Haushaltsgerät anzugeben, bei dem wenigstens eine Bedien- und/oder Anzeigekomponente auf der Innenseite einer Wand der Bedienblende mittels wenigstens eines Schraub- und/oder Rastelementes ankoppelbar und/oder mittels eines Zentrierelementes an dieser Wand ausrichtbar ist, ohne daß eine optische Beeinträchtigung der Außenseite dieser Wand auftritt. Die Lösung dieser Aufgabe erfolgt bei einer solchen Bedienblende durch das kennzeichnende Markmal des Anspruches 1. Dadurch, daß bei einer Bedienblende für ein elektrisches Haushaltsgerät mit wenigstens einer einer Bedienperson zugewandten Wand, an welche wenigstens eine Bedien- und/oder Anzeigekomponente mittels wenigstens eines Schraub- und/oder Rastelementes an einer Innenseite der Wand ankoppelbar und/oder an welcher diese Komponente mittels eines Zentrierelementes ausrichtbar ist, das Zentrier- und/oder Schraub- und/oder Rastelement einen Sockel aufweist, der mittels dünnwandiger Anbindungen an die Wand angekoppelt ist, sind bei dieser Bedienblende an der Außenseite der Wand störende Einfallstellen vermieden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); D06F 39/12 (2006.01); F24C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2013.01); D06F 39/12 (2013.01); F24C 7/082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903008 U1 20000629; EP 1029500 A2 20000823; EP 1029500 A3 20020417; EP 1029500 B1 20030723

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-17 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080410

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040422

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906350 P 20030828

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI