Global Patent Index - EP 1029502 A2

EP 1029502 A2 2000-08-23 - Dishwashing machine with cutlery holding basket

Title (en)

Dishwashing machine with cutlery holding basket

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine mit einem Besteckkorb

Title (fr)

Maschine à laver la vaisselle avec panier à couverts

Publication

EP 1029502 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00100795 A

Priority

IT PN990020 A

Abstract (en)

A rotating spray arm (5) rotates in the washing vessel (3) of the dishwashing machine and issues water spray jets (7) that scan, in correspondence of a cutlery holding basket (9), respective areas in the shape of a circular crown (13). The basket (9) has a plurality of compartments (11) provided in a side-by-side arrangement along respective curvilinear concentric rows aligned with the circular crowns (13) described by respective water spray jets (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/502 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029502 A2 20000823; EP 1029502 A3 20010103; IT 1311204 B1 20020304; IT PN990020 A1 20000818

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031212

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI