Global Patent Index - EP 1029502 A3

EP 1029502 A3 2001-01-03 - Dishwashing machine with cutlery holding basket

Title (en)

Dishwashing machine with cutlery holding basket

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine mit einem Besteckkorb

Title (fr)

Maschine à laver la vaisselle avec panier à couverts

Publication

EP 1029502 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00100795 A

Priority

IT PN990020 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1029502A2] A rotating spray arm (5) rotates in the washing vessel (3) of the dishwashing machine and issues water spray jets (7) that scan, in correspondence of a cutlery holding basket (9), respective areas in the shape of a circular crown (13). The basket (9) has a plurality of compartments (11) provided in a side-by-side arrangement along respective curvilinear concentric rows aligned with the circular crowns (13) described by respective water spray jets (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/502 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029502 A2 20000823; EP 1029502 A3 20010103; IT 1311204 B1 20020304; IT PN990020 A1 20000818

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031212

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI