Global Patent Index - EP 1029523 A2

EP 1029523 A2 2000-08-23 - Lifting device for vehicles for faciltating the bording and stepping out of a person with reduced mobility

Title (en)

Lifting device for vehicles for faciltating the bording and stepping out of a person with reduced mobility

Title (de)

Hubvorrichtung für Fahrzeuge zur Erleichterung des Ein- und Ausstiegs mobilitätsbehindererter Personen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de levage pour véhicules pour faciliter de monter et de descendre pour une personne à mobilité réduite

Publication

EP 1029523 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102891 A

Priority

DE 29902687 U

Abstract (en)

The actuating mechanism (22) of the lifting device is formed as lever drive. The lever is covered with opposite sides (17,18) of the platform (16), when the platform is in the rest position, especially when it is raised. A lever drive is arranged at each side of the platform.

Abstract (de)

Um mobilitätsbehinderten Personen die Benutzung von insbesondere öffentlichen Verkehrsmittel zu erleichtern, sind als Einstiegshilfen dienende Hubvorrichtungen bekannt. Betätigungsmittel (22) zum Anheben und Absenken einer Plattform (16) erfordern bei bekannten Hubvorrichtungen verhältnismäßig viel Platz, der bei modernen Verkehrsmitteln (Unterflurfahrzeuge) nicht mehr vorhanden ist. Die erfindungsgemäße Hubvorrichtung verfügt über als Hebetriebe ausgebildete Betätigungsmittel (22) auf gegenüberliegenden Seiten der Plattform (16), wobei Schwenkhebel (36, 37) der Hebeltriebe bei hochgefahrener Plattform (16) sich in Deckung mit gegenüberliegenden Seiten derselben befinden. Dadurch stört die Hubvorrichtung bei modernen Niederflurfahrzeugen während der Fahrt nicht, weil die Betätigungsmittel nicht nennenswert über die Plattform (16) vorstehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 23/025 (2013.01); A61G 3/06 (2013.01); A61G 3/066 (2013.01); A61G 3/067 (2016.11); A61G 3/061 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029523 A2 20000823; EP 1029523 A3 20010905; DE 29902687 U1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI