Global Patent Index - EP 1029563 A3

EP 1029563 A3 2004-12-22 - Golf putter and method of use

Title (en)

Golf putter and method of use

Title (de)

Golfputter sowie Handhabung eines Golfputters

Title (fr)

Putter de golf ainsi que son mode d'utilisation

Publication

EP 1029563 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00102266 A

Priority

DE 19906574 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1029563A2] Plastic or conglomerate of the head (1) is an integral, load-bearing structure. The shaft (2) is fastened in a bore close to the face (11). The head is balanced about an axis (Y) defined by the shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 53/04; A63B 53/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 53/00 (2015.01); A63B 53/04 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 53/007 (2013.01); A63B 53/0487 (2013.01); A63B 2053/0433 (2013.01); A63B 2053/0441 (2013.01); A63B 2053/0491 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20002804 U1 20000621; DE 19906574 A1 20000824; EP 1029563 A2 20000823; EP 1029563 A3 20041222

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-10-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI