Global Patent Index - EP 1029603 A2

EP 1029603 A2 2000-08-23 - Device for cleaning containers, such as bottles in particular

Title (en)

Device for cleaning containers, such as bottles in particular

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Behältern wie Flaschen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour nettoyer des conteneurs tels que des bouteilles

Publication

EP 1029603 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00200013 A

Priority

NL 1011337 A

Abstract (en)

Device for cleaning containers, such as bottles (2) in particular, in which the bottles are fed to the device by means of a feeding conveyor (1) and discharged from it by means of a discharging conveyor (12), in which the device comprises a cleaning conveyor (5) connecting to said feeding conveyor (1), on which cleaning conveyor (5) a number of bottles (2) can be brought to a standstill and above which cleaning conveyor a number of brushes (19) are situated, which are movable in vertical direction and are rotatingly driven, and can be brought into and out of the bottles (2). There are nozzles (22, 23) for bringing water and/or cleaning liquid into the bottles (2) before the brushes (19) are brought into them. On bringing the brushes (19) into the bottles (2), said brushes are driven with a low speed, said speed being increased when the brushes (19) are substantially within the bottles (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1029603 A2 20000823; EP 1029603 A3 20020731; NL 1011337 C1 20000822

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040803

2003-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): BE DE NL

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI